judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RENNELLS (EDWIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44040
Short Caption:RENNELLS (EDWIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38104
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR000857Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/05/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-18393
10/13/2004Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 04-18980
10/15/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-19159
10/15/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 and 2. 04-19160
11/02/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-20188
02/17/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-03180
03/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-03328
03/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/01/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 17, 2005. 05-03328