judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CORTINAS (ARMANDO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47905
Short Caption:CORTINAS (ARMANDO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43356 , 64139 , 80417
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C192895Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/16/2008 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:04/16/2008How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17586
09/07/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/22/04, 05/18/05, 05/05/06, 05/09/06, 05/10/06, 05/16/06, 05/17/06, 05/18/06, 05/19/06, 05/22/06, and 07/21/06. Court Reporter: Kris Fluker and Kristen Lunkwitz. 06-18476
09/07/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18477
10/20/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 05/05/06, 05/10/06, 05/15/06, 05/16/06, 05/17/06, 05/18/06 (v.1), 05/18/06 (v.2), 05/19/05 (v.1), 05/19/06 (v.2), and 05/22/06. Court Reporter: Kristen Lunkwitz. 06-21679
10/23/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 05/09/06, 05/17/06, and 07/21/06. Court Reporter: Kristen Lunkwitz. 06-21817
12/20/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 18, 2007. 06-26076
01/22/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 60 days. 07-01643
01/23/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/22/04 & 5/18/05. Court Reporter: Kristine A. Fluker. 07-01755
02/07/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: March 20, 2007. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 07-03046
03/23/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-06614
03/28/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: May 18, 2007. Any additional extensions of time to file the opening brief and appendix will be granted only on showing of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 07-06968
05/21/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-11223
06/25/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: July 2, 2007. Counsel cautioned. 07-13844
07/05/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 36 pages. 07-14718
07/05/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-14719
07/05/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 9. (Volumes 7, 8 & 9 are SEALED.) 07-14720
08/10/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 5, 2007. 07-17721
09/05/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-19458
10/01/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 5, 2007. 07-21635
11/07/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-24340
11/09/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-24529
11/09/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant: 5 days to file Reply Brief. 07-24570
11/13/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. 07-24683
02/28/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 16, 2008 at 1:30 p.m. (SNP08-JH/RP/MD) 08-04945
04/02/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 08-08285
04/16/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP08-JH/RP/MD
05/05/2008MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Points and Authorities. 08-11074
05/12/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shal file appellant's supplemental points and authorities received on May 5, 2008. Respondent: 10 days to file a response. 08-11833
05/12/2008BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Appellant's Supplemental Points and Authorities. 08-11078
10/30/2008Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas. Author: Parraguirre, Ron. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas. 124 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 86. SNP08-Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas. 08-27804
11/19/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 08-29573
01/09/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Publishers re: corrections to opinion. 09-00632
01/13/2009MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of his Petition for Rehearing. 09-01021
01/16/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file appellant's supplemental authority received on January 13, 2009. 09-01427
01/16/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Supplement to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Supplemental Authority in Support of his Petition for Rehearing. 09-01024
03/04/2009Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "We deny the petition for rehearing." NRAP 40(c). 09-05456
03/30/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 09-07850
03/31/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-06748
03/31/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/En Banc Reconsideration Pending.
04/03/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the the petition for en banc reconsideration received on March 30, 2009. 09-08487
04/03/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 09-07854
04/13/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 3, 2009. 09-06748
05/19/2009Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. 09-12432
08/25/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on August 17, 2009 and placed on the docket August 20, 2009 as Case No. 09-6028. 09-20593
10/20/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. 09-25629