judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WAGNER VS. STASIEWICZ

Case Information: 47906
Short Caption:WAGNER VS. STASIEWICZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0600292Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 06-17595
09/19/2006BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 06-19281
09/27/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-NB/JH/RP 06-19779
10/24/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-20967
10/24/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/02/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 25, 2006. 06-20967