judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

T.J.'S QUIK MART VS. DIST. CT. (DURANGO TWAIN, LLC)

Case Information: 44025
Short Caption:T.J.'S QUIK MART VS. DIST. CT. (DURANGO TWAIN, LLC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43915
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A484736Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Certiorari
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Shearing. Law firm of Gordon & Silver.
10/04/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gordon & Silver Ltd.--check no. 37113.
10/04/2004Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. 04-18254
10/07/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on respondents' behalf, shall have 20 days from this order's date within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 04-18614
11/01/2004Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 04-20116
12/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Reply. Petitioner shall have twenty days from the date of this order within which to file and serve a reply to the real party in interest's answer. In the reply, petitioner shall address, among other things, the real party in interest's right under the lease to demand additional monies to restore the security deposit and whether those additional monies constitute rent under the lease. Petitioner shall also attach a copy of the lease to the reply. 04-23360
01/12/2005Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioners' Reply to Opposition to Petition for Writ of Certiorari. 05-00694
02/23/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Order Granting Petition for Writ of Certiorari. As the justice's court exceeded its jurisdiction in increasing T.J.'s rent to pay for a security deposit, " . . . we grant T.J.'s petition, and we direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of certiorari directing the district court to reverse the justice's court's summary eviction order and order increasing T.J.'s rent." SNP05-R/MG/JH 05-03608
02/23/2005WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Thomas H. Fell for service upon Judge David Wall. 05-03623
02/28/2005WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge David Wall on February 25, 2005. 05-03623
03/22/2005RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 05-04539
03/22/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.