judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STULC VS. CLARK CO. SCHOOL DIST.

Case Information: 44021
Short Caption:STULC VS. CLARK CO. SCHOOL DIST.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A477146
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A479491
Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/06/2004 / Roitman, HowardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert G. Giunta--check no. 2639. (Additional $50 due.)
09/30/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18115
09/30/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (Additional $50 due.) Due Date: 10 days
09/30/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/06/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/06/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Additional $50.00 from Robert G. Giunta--check no. 2651.
10/12/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-18841
10/18/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 04-19244
11/17/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Case Appeal Statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file a case appeal statement in the district court and file, with this court, two certified copies of the case appeal statement. 04-21132
11/29/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Copy filed in district court on 9/28/04. 04-21736
12/08/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Howard Roitman. (case appeal statement)
02/09/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 21, 2005. 05-02659
03/23/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-05673
03/30/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 05-06215
07/21/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeal as Abandoned. Appellant has not responded to our order of March 30, 2005 or otherwise communicated with this court. "We dismiss this appeal as abandoned." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-14484
08/16/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-14553
08/16/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 18, 2005. 05-14553