judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALTA CANYON VS. PECCOLE-NEVADA CORP.

Case Information: 44020
Short Caption:ALTA CANYON VS. PECCOLE-NEVADA CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44172
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A459775Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/06/2004 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Rosenfeld & Hansen L.L.P.--check no. 11646.
09/30/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18102
10/06/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/18/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-19205
10/25/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 04-19707
12/16/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 2005. Nos. 44020/44172-cases are not consolidated. 04-22969
02/14/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 44020/44172-cases are not consolidated. 05-02878
02/14/2005Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. Nos. 44020/44172-cases are not consolidated. 05-02879
02/14/2005Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Nos. 44020/44172-cases are not consolidated. 05-02880
02/22/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 05-03403
02/22/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.