judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GUERRERO (SANTIAGO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44041
Short Caption:GUERRERO (SANTIAGO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFP030146Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/05/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-18395
10/05/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: September 20, 2004. Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. Filed in district court on: September 30, 2004. 04-18396
10/26/2004TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 09/20/04. Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. 04-19780
11/15/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-20946
11/15/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-20947
11/22/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-21426
02/03/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP05-NB/RR/JH 05-02227
03/01/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-02375
03/01/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/07/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 3, 2005. 05-02375