judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7811
B-7811
08/03/1978
MISC PETITION
JOANNE TINKLE WEST
ROBERT BERRY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/16/1978Response to Brief filedRelator
08/09/1978Brief on the MeritsRespondent
08/04/1978Motion for RehearingRelator
08/03/1978Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/18/1978Order from Lower Court filed
08/16/1978Response to Brief filed
08/09/1978Brief on the Merits
08/04/1978Order from Lower Court filed
08/04/1978Motion for RehearingFiling granted
08/03/1978Motion for emergency stay filedOverruled
08/03/1978Exhibits in case/cause filed
08/03/1978Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joanne Tinkle WestRelator
Robert BerryRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information