judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALZA CORP. VS. HOUSTON

Case Information: 44032
Short Caption:ALZA CORP. VS. HOUSTONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0402061Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/14/2004 / Gang, LeonardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger.
10/04/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger--check no. 019713.
10/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18345
10/14/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Leonard I. Gang. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/19/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-19342
10/22/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 04-19610
11/17/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Notice of Appearance and Intent to Participate. 04-21100
11/17/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Correction to Case Appeal Statement. 04-21101
02/14/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-02901
02/22/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-03527
03/02/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 05-04099
05/24/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 2, 2005. 05-10215
06/07/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-11112
06/07/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 05-11113
07/01/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-13155
07/01/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 05-13156
08/02/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-15352
08/02/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1[We have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this case. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-16067
08/29/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-16808
08/29/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/07/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 31, 2006. 06-16808