judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNEDY VS. KENNEDY

Case Information: 44033
Short Caption:KENNEDY VS. KENNEDYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D79130Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/15/2004 / Graves, JohnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/19/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18352
10/04/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/04/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/15/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John J. Graves, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/18/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Dan M. Winder - check no. 1800.
11/12/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 22, 2004 at 9:30 a.m. 04-20817
11/17/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Case Appeal Statement and docketing Statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file a case appeal statement in the district court and file, with this court, two certified copies of the case appeal statement. Appellant shall also, within that same time period, file and serve the docketing statement. 04-21135
12/27/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 10, 2005. 04-23451
01/05/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Case Appeal Statement and docketing Statement. To date, appellant has failed to comply with the order filed on November 17, 2004. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file a case appeal statement in the district court and file, with this court, two certified copies of the case appeal statement. Appellant shall also, within that same time period, file and serve the docketing statement. fn1[Appellant shall serve the case appeal statement and the docketing statement on counsel for respondent and on settlement judge John J. Graves, Jr.] Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. 05-00252
02/18/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 3, 2005. 05-03387
03/21/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 4, 2005. 05-05479
04/07/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 28, 2005. 05-06882
05/02/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 10, 2005. 05-08580
05/13/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 24, 2005. 05-09411
06/06/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 15, 2005. 05-11042
06/09/2005Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. To date, appellant has failed to comply with this court's notices and orders and has not otherwise communicated with this court. We conclude that counsel's conduct under these circumstances warrants the imposition of sanction. Appellant's attorney, Dan M. Winder, shall have 15 days from the date of this order to personally pay the sum of $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library. Within the same time period, Mr. Winder shall also file proof of such payment with the clerk of this court. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a case appeal statement in the district court and file, with this court, two certified copies of the case appeal statement. Further, appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. We caution Mr. Winder that failure to timely comply with this order may result in the imposition of additional sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal and referral of this matter to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation pursuant to SCR 105. Fn1 [Appellant shall serve a copy of the case appeal statement on the settlement judge.] (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 05-11342
06/20/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-12099
06/28/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Notice of Filing Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on June 27, 2005. 05-12857
06/28/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-12858
06/28/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction. Check no. 2108 in the amount of $500.00 payable to the Supreme Court Law Library. 05-12859
09/26/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 10 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-19049
10/13/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.
11/03/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 05-21753
12/29/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 26, 2006. 05-25386
02/14/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Opening Brief. Opening brief and appendix due: 15 days. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 06-03250
03/01/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-04622
03/01/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 06-04626
03/16/2006AppendixFiled Appendix. Supplement to Appellant's Appendix. 06-05722
04/24/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Answering Brief.
05/11/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-09890
05/11/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 06-09891
06/13/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: July 12, 2006. 06-12353
07/13/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-14535
07/13/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. (for 07/13/06 motion) Due date: 10 days.
07/24/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service (for 6/13/06 motion.) 06-15379
07/25/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for motion for enlargement of time to file reply brief. 06-15454
07/27/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply brief due: August 11, 2006. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 06-15597
08/15/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-16978
01/19/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 07-01415
01/19/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-03270
03/07/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-04885
03/07/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/20/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 12, 2007. 07-04885