judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WISNIES, JR. (EDWARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44037
Short Caption:WISNIES, JR. (EDWARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C185041Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/13/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/05/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-18390
10/21/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 9/30/04 Notice of Entry of Decision and Order. Due Date: 10 days
11/01/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on September 30, 2004. 04-19997
12/02/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 44037/44180/44181/44216/44238 - not consolidated. 04-21961
12/13/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 04-22740
12/13/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/29/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. The record before this court does not contain transcripts of the district court hearings held on July 15, 2002, September 9, 2002, and September 2, 2003. Transcripts of these hearings are necessary for this court's review of this appeal. Accordingly, if the transcripts have been prepared and filed with the district court, the clerk of the district court shall transmit certified copies to the clerk of this court within 10 days from the date of this order as a supplemental record on appeal. If the transcripts have not been prepared and filed below, the district court shall order their prompt preparation. If such an order is required, the clerk of the district court shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to transmit a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of the district court shall then have 10 days from the date the transcripts are filed within which to transmit certified copies to the clerk of this court as a supplemental record on appeal. 04-23632
01/18/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 15, 2002. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 05-01100
01/21/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 09/09/04. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. 05-01431
02/04/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/15/02, 9/9/02, 9/2/03. Submitted by Clark Co. Clerk. 05-02310
02/07/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 09/02/03. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 05-02448
03/22/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that Wisnies is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-05562
04/19/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-06113
04/19/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/05/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2005. 05-06113