judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILLER (EDWARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44038
Short Caption:MILLER (EDWARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45431
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C196939Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/05/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. 04-18391
11/01/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-20054
11/30/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-20500
11/30/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 2, 2004. 04-20500