judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JIMENEZ (JAIME) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44035
Short Caption:JIMENEZ (JAIME) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 49794
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C192155Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/05/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 04-18388
11/30/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Appellant's counsel Jeffrey S. Posin shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 04-21786
12/13/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-22658
12/13/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-22659
01/07/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-00375
04/19/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn5[Because Jimenez is represented by counsel in this matter, we decline to grant Jimenez permission to file documents in proper person in this court. The clerk of this court shall return to Jimenez unfiled all proper person documents he has submitted to this court in this matter.] SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-07537
04/19/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Jaime Pablo Jimenez. Returned unfiled the proper person "Motion for Substitution of Attorneys received November 17, 2004; Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief received November 17, 2004; Letter received March 24, 2005."
05/17/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-07765
05/17/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/20/2005MotionFiled Motion. no action required -case closed. 05-10012
06/01/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 19, 2005. 05-07765