judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOYING VS. HOYING

Case Information: 44034
Short Caption:HOYING VS. HOYINGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D293281Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/15/2004 / Graves, JohnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18356
10/04/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/12/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Edwin Hoying, Jr. - money order no. 4516554169.
10/15/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John J. Graves, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/21/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-19442
11/22/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 15, 2004. 04-21430
11/22/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days.
12/03/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 04-22133
12/20/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 11, 2005. 04-23147
01/14/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 27, 2005. 05-00907
01/31/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-01965
02/10/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 05-02689
04/21/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal as abandoned." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-07726
05/17/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-07792
05/17/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 19, 2005. 05-07792
06/06/2005Other Returned Mail. Order Dismissing Appeal addressed to Judge Lisa Brown remailed to corrected address.