Case: WR-87,424-01
WR-87,424-01
09/15/2017
11.07 HC
SOSA, ANGEL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/08/2019 | ACTION TAKEN | HC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-w/o Hear |
| ||||
04/17/2019 | SUPP RECD |
| |||||
09/04/2018 | ADDRESS CHANGE | | |||||
07/20/2018 | 2ND REMINDER ON OVERDUE REMAND | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
04/11/2018 | REMINDER | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
04/06/2018 | STATUS (INMATE CORRES) | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
11/01/2017 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
09/15/2017 | WRIT RECEIVED |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/08/2019 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SOSA, ANGEL | Applicant |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
363rd District Court
Dallas
W12-53635-W (A)