judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JONES VS. SCHUTT

Case Information: 44028
Short Caption:JONES VS. SCHUTTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45327
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A463984Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Becker for Justice MaupinPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger.
10/04/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-18312
10/04/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
02/02/2005Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Steven J. Savarda regarding briefing in this appeal. 05-02127
03/03/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn3[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from him, and deny any relief requested as moot in light of this order. NNP05-NB/MD/RP 05-04218
03/29/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-04689
03/29/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/07/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 31, 2005. 05-04689