judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHAVEZ (CHARLES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44023
Short Caption:CHAVEZ (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37759 , 56379 , 56398 , 60741 , 74554 , 74554-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C146562Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/21/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/30/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18145
09/30/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: all (no dates listed.) To Court Reporter: Sonia L. Riley. 04-18148
10/04/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 08/27/04. To Court Reporter: Sonia L. Riley. 04-18334
10/15/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-19139
10/25/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusion of Law and Order filed on September 29, 2004 and Notice of Entry of Order filed on October 11, 2004. Due Date: 10 days
11/01/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusion of Law and Order filed on September 29, 2004 and Notice of Entry of Order filed on October 11, 2004 04-20071
12/20/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] To date court reporter Sonia Riley has not filed the requested transcript. Ms. Riley shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcript. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcript, Ms. Riley shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Ms. Riley shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 04-23119
01/03/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 27, 2004. Court Reporter: Sonia L. Riley-Bennett. 05-00088
01/24/2005MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Permisison to File an Opening Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. 05-01508
01/26/2005BriefReceived Opening Brief.
01/26/2005AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 7. 05-01673
02/07/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed January 24, 2005. The clerk shall file the 53-page brief and appendix received on January 26, 2005. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. 05-02414
02/07/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-01672
02/07/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 7. 05-01673
03/02/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. STRICKEN BY ORDER 05/02/05. jcr
03/02/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 05-04071
04/21/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed.
05/02/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Striking Answering Brief. The Clark County District Attorney filed an answering brief in this appeal on March 2, 2005. The factual statement involves an entirely different defendant. The clerk of this court shall strike the answering brief filed on March 2, 2005. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve an appropriate answering brief. Appellant shall have 30 days thereafter to file and serve a reply brief. 05-08590
05/24/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-10231
06/29/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-12865
07/26/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-12995
07/26/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/04/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 29, 2005. 05-12995