judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DYRELL GAMBLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1008
Short Caption:DYRELL GAMBLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL7642-98Filed Date:08/11/2010

Opening Event Date:08/11/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/09/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/29/2010
Argued/Submitted:04/20/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDyrell Gamble YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Nicholas P. ColemanYY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/11/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 11, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
09/09/2010RECORD INDEX
09/09/2010RECORD COPIES
09/09/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/14/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
09/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (gov't motion for additonal time to respond to defendant's pro se petition for a writ of error coram nobis filed 10/9/09)
10/22/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/22/2010APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
11/29/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/29/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (Record transferred from 01-CF-1091)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (Record transferred from 01-CF-1106) (Only one copy available)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (Record transferred from 03-CO-1490) (Only one copy available)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (Record transferred from 03-CO-1569) (Only one copy available)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (32pgs/Allison) 1/18/01 proc. (Transferred from case 01CF1091)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (190pgs/Sargent-Burns) 1/10/01 proc. (Transferred from case 01CF1091)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (20pgs/Tanner) 8/8/01 proc. (Transferred from case 01CF1091)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (379pgs/Sargent-Burns) 1/16-17/01 proc. (Transferred from case 01CF1106)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (257pgs/Hunt) 1/10-11/01 proc. (Transferred from case 01CF1106)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (164pgs/Sargent-Burns) 1/9/01 proc. (Transferred from case 01CF1091)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (5pgs/Tape) 5/18/01 proc. (Transferred from case 01CF1091)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (14pgs/Tape) 9/18/00 proc. (Transferred from 01CF1091)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (27pgs/Graybrill) 11/18/03 proc. (Transferred from case 01CF1091)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (36pgs/Shaw) 11/14/03 proc. (Transferred from case 03CO1490)
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (22pgs/Coney) 12/24/02 proc. (Transferred from case 01CF1091)
03/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/20/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/20/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Thompson, Oberly, Nebeker
04/26/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Thompson and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
05/18/2011MANDATE ISSUED