Case Information: 34803 | |||
Short Caption: | SCRUGGS (GLENN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C146111 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/27/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/10/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
09/10/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-08529 | |
10/07/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34767, 34781, 34799, 34803. | 99-09643 | |
01/27/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 01/24/00. | 00-01342 | |
01/27/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/12/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Supplemental record (certified copy of the transcripts dated: December 4, 1997; December 10, 1997; February 2, 1998; and March 29, 1999) due: 30 days. | 01-09799 | |
07/09/2001 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order for Transcript filed in district court on June 25, 2001. | 01-11460 | |
07/09/2001 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Granting Transcripts at the State's Expense filed in district court on June 27, 2001. | 01-11461 | |
09/06/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 2. | 01-15077 | |
09/07/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 12/4/97, 12/10/97, 2/2/98. Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin. | 01-15146 | |
10/11/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP02Y-CY/DA/ML | 01-17146 | |
11/07/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-17338 | |
11/07/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/15/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2001. | 01-17338 |