judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-332
A-332
09/05/1944
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
GILBERT SNEED, ET AL., HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY, STANOLIND OIL AND GAS COMPANY, STANDARD OIL COMPANY OF KANSAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/07/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
10/26/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/22/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
09/16/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
09/15/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/13/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
09/13/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
09/11/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
09/05/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/16/1944Letter Filed
11/13/1944Response to Motion filed
11/07/1944Brief in Support of Petition
10/26/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/22/1944Supplemental Brief filed
09/16/1944Response to Petition
09/15/1944Reply to Response
09/13/1944Response to Petition
09/13/1944Response to Petition
09/11/1944Supplemental Brief filed
09/05/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
09/05/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stanolind Oil and Gas CompanyRespondent
Standard Oil Company of KansasRespondent
Gilbert Sneed, et al.Respondent
Humble Oil and Refining CompanyRespondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information