judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LANCASTER (CLARENCE) VS. NEV. BOARD OF PAROLE COMMISSIONERS

Case Information: 47917
Short Caption:LANCASTER (CLARENCE) VS. NEV. BOARD OF PAROLE COMMISSIONERSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2006Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 06-17780
09/07/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Attorney General to file Response. Response due: 15 days. 06-18437
09/25/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-19661
12/11/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-25227
01/05/2007RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 07-00176
01/05/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.