judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRINAR VS. CATANIA

Case Information: 47907
Short Caption:BRINAR VS. CATANIACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A479961Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 06-17600
08/24/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
11/09/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal." fn4[Appellant's failure to pay the filing fee or otherwise comply with NRAP 24(a) constitutes an independent basis for dismissing this appeal.] SNP07M-RR/MG/WM 06-23015
12/06/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-24094
12/06/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/14/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 8, 2006. 06-24094