judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LYONS (PHILLIP) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 44045
Short Caption:LYONS (PHILLIP) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35151 , 38454 , 43287 , 46520 , 48269 , 50002 , 54231 , 54598 , 55760 , 56523 , 58206 , 62569 , 62837
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C097533Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/03/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/06/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/06/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-18538
10/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 60 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings). fn2[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] 04-19565
12/03/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 thorugh 3. 04-22111
12/03/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/16/2004Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Clark County Clerk in response to order filed October 22, 2004. 04-22930
02/22/2005Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Clark County Clerk in response to order filed October 22, 2004. 05-03467
03/08/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. In the event the district court enters a written judgment or order (or has already entered a written judgment or order of which this court is unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. 05-04617
04/04/2005Other Other. Filed letter from d.c. clerk enclosing copies of Order filed on 3/31/04 and Order filed 3/29/05. 05-06574
05/03/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing District Court to enter a Written Order and Directing the Clerk of the District Court to Transmit the Written Order. District Judge Gates shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which: (1) to enter a written judgment or order resolving the 'First Amendment Writ' filed by appellant on August 18, 2004, or (2) to inform this court that he is reconsidering his oral decision of August 30, 2004. The clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. fn4[We deny as moot the relief requested in proper person document filed on February 16, 2005.] If counsel has failed to timely prepare a written order as directed, Judge Gates shall inform this court of that fact in a separate written response. 05-08644
05/13/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 8/30/04. Court Reporter: Sonia L. Riley. 05-09408
05/18/2005Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from District Judge Lee Gates. The court will reconsider the defendant's August 18, 2004, pleading and will issue a decision per the May 3, 2005, order. 05-09714
06/14/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn3[Because the district court has informed this court that it is reconsidering its decision, we vacate that portion of our order directing the district court to inform this court whether the State had failed to prepare a timely written order for the district court's consideration. This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-11611
07/12/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-12725
07/12/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/22/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 15, 2005. 05-12725