judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAAJANEN (STEVEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47897
Short Caption:PAAJANEN (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47999
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C208671Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:CherryCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice CherryPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/02/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17564
09/15/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-19092
10/25/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. As the trial court record for Case No. C208671 is required for both appeals (nos. 47897 and 47999), we hereby modify our orders and direct the clerk of the district court to transmit to the clerk of this court, within 30 days, one trial court record for Case No. C208671. The clerk of this court shall thereafter file it in Docket No. 47897. This court will utilize the record filed in Docket No. 47897 in resolving both appeals. 47897 and 47999 (not consolidated) 06-21881
11/02/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. clerk5 06-22447
11/02/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/28/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/05/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn6[We have reviewed all proper person documents, and we conclude that no relief is warranted.] SNP07-WM/MG/MD 07-00307
01/30/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-01986
01/30/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/01/2007Other Other. The remittitur was issued in No. 47897 on January 30, 2007. The Record on Appeal filed on November 2, 2006, in No. 47897 was transferred and filed in No. 47999.jcr
02/08/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 5, 2007. 07-01986