judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: 94-0169
94-0169
02/22/1994
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
ELIZABETH ANN WACHTER individually and as representative of the estate of LANCE WACHTER
THE HONORABLE MICHAEL PEDEN JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/03/1994Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondenton behalf of Oakley Transport Co. & Charles M. Thomas
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/12/1994Case StoredNo Mo/Re filed
03/09/1994M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruledW/NOT: "WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILE, SHOULD RELATOR'S APPEAL BOND BE STRUCK OR DECLARED INSUFFICIENT"
03/03/1994Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamuson behalf of Oakley Transport Co. & Charles M. Thomas
03/01/1994Call receivedReal Paties will file a reply by Friday, March 4, 1994 attorney Ed Maniez call to office gb
02/22/1994Exhibits receivedattached to petition
02/22/1994Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
02/22/1994Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/12/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
OAKLEY TRANSPORT CO.RespondentMr. Edward C. Mainz Jr.
KNAPP, JOHN M.RespondentMr. Forrest N. Welmaker Jr.
VARGAS, MARY HELENRespondentMs. Mary Helen Vargas
OAKLEY TRANSPORT COMPANYRespondentMr. Joe Frazier Brown
THOMAS, CHARLES M.RespondentMr. Joe Frazier Brown
KERNODLE, CATHERINERespondentMs. Catherine Kernodle
WACHTER, LANCERelatorMr. Sean F. O'Neill
ESTATE OF LANCE WACHTERRespondentMr. Peter J. Balega
WACHTER, ELIZABETH ANNRelatorMr. Peter J. Balega
Court of Appeals Information:
04-93-00712-CV
Denied
RULE 90, 12-07-93
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
150th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Michael Parker Peden
92-CI-05534