Case: 14-19-00540-CV
14-19-00540-CV
07/10/2019
Miscellaneous/other civil
Winston Nguyen
Vuong Pham and I Buy Beauty, LLC d/b/a Fastboy Marketing
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/05/2019 | Case stored | | |||||||
12/05/2019 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
12/02/2019 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||
11/04/2019 | Petition for review was not filed | | |||||||
11/04/2019 | Petition for review due in Supreme Court | | |||||||
09/30/2019 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
09/19/2019 | Motion for en banc reconsideration disposed | DENIED |
| ||||||
09/19/2019 | Motion for rehearing disposed | DENIED |
| ||||||
08/28/2019 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
08/27/2019 | Motion for rehearing filed |
| |||||||
08/27/2019 | Motion for en banc reconsideration filed |
| |||||||
08/22/2019 | Document returned |
| |||||||
08/21/2019 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
08/13/2019 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||||
08/13/2019 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||||
08/12/2019 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
08/12/2019 | Submitted | | |||||||
08/06/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||||
08/06/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
08/02/2019 | Response due | | |||||||
08/01/2019 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
07/29/2019 | Reply to response or motion filed |
| |||||||
07/29/2019 | Response due | | |||||||
07/25/2019 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
07/24/2019 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
07/23/2019 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||||
07/22/2019 | Court fee due | | |||||||
07/18/2019 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
07/18/2019 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record |
| |||||||
07/18/2019 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
07/18/2019 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
07/18/2019 | Record due | | |||||||
07/12/2019 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
07/11/2019 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
07/10/2019 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
07/10/2019 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
07/10/2019 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
07/08/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
06/19/2019 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/05/2019 | Case Stored | Case stored |
12/05/2025 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas Workforce Commission | Unknown | William Cohen |
Vuong Pham and I Buy Beauty, LLC d/b/a Fastboy Marketing | Appellee | William Cohen Robert Edwin Ray |
Nguyen, Winston | Appellant | Thanh Nguyen |
Trial Court Information
61st District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 61st District Court
2018-89187
Court Reporter, 61st District Court