judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUPUY (DENNIS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38172
Short Caption:DUPUY (DENNIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010320Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-12079
08/13/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Notice of No Request for Rough Draft Transcript. 01-13697
08/13/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-13698
08/13/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-13699
08/22/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-14241
09/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-15425
10/09/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-15692
10/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 22, 2001. 01-15692