judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL C. IRVING V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 10-AA-1056
Short Caption:MICHAEL C. IRVING V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PWVK122328-06Filed Date:08/25/2010

Opening Event Date:08/25/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/31/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/23/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/31/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMichael C. Irving NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY
Donna M. MuraskyNY
Stacy L. AndersonYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/25/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
08/25/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
08/26/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
09/03/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY- appeal
09/07/2010TMC - motion to stay appeal - oppo
09/09/2010RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- to motion for stay pending appeal
09/14/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED. See Barry v. Washington Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987)... It is *****MORE*****
09/14/2010 F/ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (FITHNW) (kt)
01/03/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcript
01/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/15/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
02/15/2011APPENDIX
03/21/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (unopposed) to 4/21/11
03/29/2011 On consideration of respondent's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before April 21, 2011. (JAC)
04/21/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 29 days
05/16/2011 On consideration of respondent's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before May 20, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
05/16/2011FiledRESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/17/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
08/31/2011FiledOrder Denying MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and the Clerk SHALL FILE THE MOTION AS THE BRIEF
08/31/2011FiledBrief - MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE FILED AS THE BRIEF PER 8/31/11 ORDER (Respondent)
08/31/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/23/2012FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judges Easterly, Pryor
07/06/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Easterly, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
07/31/2012FiledMandate