judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-94-00182-CR
14-94-00182-CR
02/22/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Martinez, Steven Richard
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/1996Case stored
11/27/1996Mandate due to be issued
11/27/1996Mandate Issued
11/27/1996Mandate Issued
11/12/1996Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
07/29/1996Petition for discretionary review due
07/29/1996Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
07/12/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
06/27/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/27/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/16/1996Mtn.Lv. file supp.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPDENIED
05/02/1996Mtn.Lv. file supp.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPDENIED
05/02/1996Submitted
05/02/1996Submission
05/02/1996Submitted
05/01/1996Mtn.Lv. file supp.brief FILED - ANT,APE,APP
05/01/1996Mtn.Lv. file supp.brief FILED - ANT,APE,APP
03/21/1996Submission
12/08/1995No description available.
12/04/1995Statement of Facts Due
11/22/1995Motion to substitute attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
11/16/1995Motion to substitute attorney FILED-ANT,APE
11/02/1995Motion to abate DISPOSED - APP, STAGRANTED
11/02/1995Order Entered
10/24/1995Motion to abate FILED - APP, STA
05/18/1995Mtn.withdraw as attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APE,DENIED
05/11/1995Mtn.withdraw as attorney FILED-ANT,APE
04/17/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/17/1995Case ready to be set
04/17/1995State's brief DUE
04/17/1995Case ready to be set
03/23/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/17/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/17/1995State's brief DUE
02/23/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/17/1995State's brief DUE
02/15/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/26/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/23/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/17/1995State's brief DUE
12/20/1994Appellant's brief DUE
12/20/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/20/1994Order Entered
12/01/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/01/1994Order Entered
11/22/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/27/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/19/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/19/1994Past due brief
10/07/1994Appellant's brief DUE
09/15/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/09/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/08/1994Past due brief
08/08/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
06/30/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
06/27/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
06/22/1994No description available.
04/28/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
04/20/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
04/20/1994No description available.
04/19/1994Transcript FILED
02/22/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/18/1994Date of Sentence
02/18/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/18/2017Case StoredCase archived
11/27/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - AppellantStanley G. Schneider
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasCarol M. Cameron
MARTINEZ, STEVEN RICHARDCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable CARL WALKER
667467
50 yrs. TDC