judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-94-00184-CR
14-94-00184-CR
02/22/1994
Robbery
Pattum, Avery
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/06/1995Case stored
06/21/1995Mandate Issued
06/21/1995Mandate Issued
06/06/1995Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
04/17/1995Petition for discretionary review due
03/29/1995Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/27/1995Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/16/1995Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
03/08/1995Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
02/23/1995Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/23/1995Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/22/1995Submitted
02/22/1995Submission
02/22/1995Submitted
10/27/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/27/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/11/1994Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA,
10/11/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/10/1994Case ready to be set
10/10/1994Case ready to be set
09/22/1994Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
09/13/1994Past due brief
09/12/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/12/1994Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
08/11/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/01/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/07/1994Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STADENIED
06/30/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
06/30/1994Motion to consolidate DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
06/30/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
06/28/1994Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
06/27/1994Motion to consolidate FILED-ANT,APE,APP
06/23/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
06/23/1994Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
05/05/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
04/29/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
04/25/1994No description available.
04/22/1994Transcript FILED
02/22/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/21/1994Date of Sentence
02/21/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/21/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasErnest Davila
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantRoland B. Moore, III
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
489977
45 yrs. TDC