judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ABIGAIL PADOU V. DC BD OF ELECTIONS & ETHICS

Case Information: 10-AA-1062
Short Caption:ABIGAIL PADOU V. DC BD OF ELECTIONS & ETHICSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Bd Elections & Ethics (BEE)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:004-10Filed Date:08/26/2010

Opening Event Date:08/26/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/15/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/07/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/15/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/2012
Expedited

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAbigail Padou NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Board of Elections & EthicsN
Kenneth J. McGhieNN
Rudolph M.D. McGannNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/26/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
08/26/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
08/26/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Kenneth J. Mcghie, Esq.
10/15/2010RECORD ON APPEAL - Exhibits A thru Q
10/15/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/27/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that this appeal is hereby expedited. It is F/O that appellant's brief and the appendix, including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 39(a)(1), shall be filed no later than December 8, 2010, the brief of appellee shall be filed no later than January 7, 2011, and the reply brief of appellant, if any, shall be filed no later than January 28, 2011. See D.C. App. R. 31. It is F/O that this case shall be placed on the calendar of February, 2011. As these dates have been set to enable the court to schedule this case on this calendar, it is F/O that any requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of extraordinary circumstances. (ETW)
10/27/2010LETTER TO COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING (Feb. 2011) Padoue McGhie
12/08/2010LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING petitioner
12/08/2010PETITIONER'S BRIEF w/appendix attached
12/08/2010APPENDIX- petititoner
12/16/2010CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
01/07/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
01/07/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/26/2011CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 respondent
02/02/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF no oppo
02/02/2011RECEIVED - petitioner's reply brief
02/15/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/15/2011FiledARGUED before Blackbunre-Rigsby,Thompson,Oberly. Abigail Padou Pro Se for Petitioner. Renee Christensen Esq.,for Resonpdent.
02/16/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEF and the lodged reply brief is filed. (B-R,TH,OB)
02/16/2011PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF
07/07/2011PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for substitution of counsel
07/19/2011FiledOrder Granting respondent's unopposed motion for substitution of counsel. (B-R,TH,OB)
03/15/2012FiledDismissed as moot
04/06/2012FiledMandate