judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUN CITY VS. STATE, DEPT OF TAXATION

Case Information: 38171
Short Caption:SUN CITY VS. STATE, DEPT OF TAXATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36222
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A327534Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/25/2001 / Cohen, LarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt.
07/16/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from McDonald Carano Wilson McCune Bergin Frankovich & Hicks--check no. 8378.
07/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12078
07/18/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/18/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. County of Clark and Mark Schofield, Clark County Assessor. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 01-12208
07/18/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Parties are advised to notify this court immediately if a change of designation of parties is desired.
07/20/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. State of Nevada and Department of Taxation. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 01-12390
07/25/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry J. Cohen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/02/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 01-13085
08/03/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Larry J. Cohen.
10/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, both the County and State have failed to file their docketing statements. The County and State shall each have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve a docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for the State and County.) 01-17262
10/19/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant (State). 01-17675
10/23/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Larry J. Cohen.
10/25/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondents/Cross-Appellants Clark County and Schofiled 01-17975
10/29/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Larry J. Cohen.
07/19/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Deputy Attorney General Dawn Nala Kemp, in place of Senior Deputy Attorney General Elaine S. Guenaga for State of Nevada Department of Taxation. 02-12452
07/29/2002Notice/Outgoing Letter. Larry J. Cohen. (Notice of Change of Representation)
08/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. An additional settlement conference has been scheduled for September 5, 2002. Although we strongly support the parties' efforts to resolve this matter without the need for further litigation, we are also committed to the timely resolution of appeals before this court. The parties shall have until September 20, 2002 to either (1) resolve these matters and file a stipulation to dismiss these appeals or (2) show cause why the briefing schedules should not be reinstated. Nos. 36222/38171-case are not consolidated. 02-13864
09/09/2002MotionFiled Motion. Parties' Joint Request for Continued Suspension of Briefing Schedule. Nos. 36222 and 38171 (not consolidated). 02-15496
10/01/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed September 9, 2002. The parties shall have until October 31, 2002, to resolve these appeals and file a stipulation to dismiss these appeals. If the parties do not file a stipulation to dismiss these appeals by October 31, 2002, this court will reinstate the briefing of these appeals. Nos. 36222/38171-cases are not consolidated. 02-16927
11/27/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-20470
12/06/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conferences, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . these appeals and cross-appeals are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK. Nos. 36222/38171-cases are not consolidated. 02-20924
12/06/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.