Case: D-3229
D-3229
12/23/1992
App Writ Err (2) Originally filed as 130(d)
LONE STAR GAS COMPANY AN UNINCORPORATED DIVISION OF ENSERCH CORPORATION AND ENSERCH EXPLORATION INC.
MARTHA MIERS MARTHA JO FINKLEA WILLIAM L. FINKLEA LARRY L. FINKLEA AND MARSHA FINKLEA CARDWELL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/09/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/27/1993 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Respondent | To motions for rehearing and to motion for publication | |
05/20/1993 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | behalf of Lone Star Gas CompanySequence #: 01 | |
05/20/1993 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | behalf of Enserch Exploration, Inc.Sequence #: 02 | |
03/15/1993 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
03/02/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
03/02/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | of Enserch Exploration, Inc.Sequence #: 02 | |
03/02/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | of Lone Star Gas Company Et Al.Sequence #: 01 | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/09/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
07/06/1993 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | Rehearing Overruled | | |
06/30/1993 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | motion for rehearing overruled. Justice___not sit | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
06/30/1993 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | motion for rehearing overruled. Justice___not sit | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
06/30/1993 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | motion for rehearing overruled. Justice___not sit | Of Enserch Exploration (Justice Doggett not sitting.) | |
06/30/1993 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | motion for rehearing overruled. Justice___not sit | Of Lone Star Gas Company (J.DOGGETT NOT SITTING). | |
06/30/1993 | Petition to S.Ct. to publish C.A. opinion disposed | Denied | BEHALF/ENSERCH (J.DOGGETT NOT SITTING). | |
05/27/1993 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | To motions for rehearing and to motion for publication | | |
05/21/1993 | Petition to publish CA opinion under TRAP 90(c) | behalf of Enserch Exploration, Inc. | | |
05/20/1993 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
05/20/1993 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
05/20/1993 | Motion for Rehearing | behalf of Lone Star Gas CompanySequence #: 01 | | |
05/20/1993 | Motion for Rehearing | behalf of Enserch Exploration, Inc.Sequence #: 02 | | |
05/20/1993 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remains in clerk's office | | |
05/05/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
05/05/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Two applications for writ of error denied. | Lone Star Gas Company's App Denied Justice Doggett Not SittingSequence #: 01 | |
05/05/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | Enserch Exploration, Inc.'s app is denied Justice Doggett not sittingSequence #: 02 | |
03/16/1993 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
03/15/1993 | Reply to Response | | | |
03/02/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | | |
03/02/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | of Enserch Exploration, Inc.Sequence #: 02 | | |
03/02/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | of Lone Star Gas Company Et Al.Sequence #: 01 | | |
12/23/1992 | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILED | due 02-10-93 | | |
12/23/1992 | Extension of time to file app writ err disposed of | Filing granted | app due 02-10-93 | |
12/23/1992 | Extension of time to file app writ err filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/06/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Rehearing Overruled |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
FINKLEA, MARTHA JO | Respondent | Mr. J. Bruce Bennett |
CARDWELL, MARSHA FINKLEA | Respondent | Mr. Randol Lane Stout |
ENSERCH EXPLORATION, INC. | Petitioner | Mr. Randall C. Grasso Mr. H. Dustin Fillmore Mr. K. Marvin Adams |
MARTHA MIERS ET AL. | Respondent | Mr. John A. Cardwell Mr. Walter W. Cardwell III |
MIERS, MARTHA | Respondent | Mr. Jeffery L. Hart |
FINKLEA, WILLIAM L. | Respondent | Mr. James D. Baskin III |
FINKLEA, LARRY L. | Respondent | Mr. Jeffery L. Hart |
LONE STAR GAS COMPANY | Petitioner | Mr. E. R. Norwood Mr. C. Clint Adams |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-91-00509-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 09-23-92
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable FRED BIERY
Trial Court Information
112th District Court
Sutton
3670