Case: 17-0998
17-0998
12/06/2017
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
VINMAR OVERSEAS SINGAPORE PTE LTD
PTT INTERNATIONAL TRADING PTE LTD
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/08/2018 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Vinmar Overseas Singapore PTE Ltd. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/26/2018 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
03/16/2018 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
02/13/2018 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
01/08/2018 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Vinmar Overseas Singapore PTE Ltd. |
| |||||
12/06/2017 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Petition for Review is due January 8, 2018. |
| ||||
12/06/2017 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Vinmar Overseas Singapore PTE Ltd. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/26/2018 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
PTT International Trading PTE Ltd | Respondent | Ms. Kelley L. Clark Mr. Jonathan M. Hyman |
Vinmar Overseas Singapore PTE Ltd | Petitioner | Mr. Joseph D. Sibley IV |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-16-00934-CV
Affirmed
538 SW3d 126, 10-24-17
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable John J. Donovan
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
Honorable William R. Burke
2016-21265