judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUFF (ROBERT) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 38161
Short Caption:BUFF (ROBERT) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR94P2425AClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/25/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/12/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/12/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11881
07/17/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12149
09/04/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. 01-14901
09/06/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-15061
11/09/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 11/09/01 (Reno/Carson). 01-18730
11/09/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-18731
12/04/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 12/03/01. 01-20266
01/25/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed.
04/30/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-07619
05/28/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-07709
05/28/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/03/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 30, 2002. 02-07709