judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONALD H. ANDRES V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 10-AA-1048
Short Caption:DONALD H. ANDRES V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PWVK126206-07Filed Date:08/24/2010

Opening Event Date:08/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/17/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDonald H. Andres NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY
Carl J. SchifferleNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/06/2000 On consideration of respondent's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before May 18, 2011. (dlm)
08/24/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW and Request for Stay.
08/24/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
08/25/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
09/14/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
01/20/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/ 11/20/07 hearing
01/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/18/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 25, 2011, directing petitioner to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
03/31/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF & Appendix.
03/31/2011RECEIVED Appendix to Petitioner's Brief.
03/31/2011RECEIVED Petitioner's Brief.
04/04/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for for leave to file the lodged brief and appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's motion is granted and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
04/04/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
04/04/2011APPENDIX
05/03/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 5/18/11
05/17/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/19/2011TMC - respondent's motion to extend briefinfg (-) - motion for summary affirmance
08/31/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
08/31/2011FiledAffirmed
10/17/2011FiledMandate