judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMIL F. MUHAMMAD V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 10-AA-1049
Short Caption:JAMIL F. MUHAMMAD V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB132-09Filed Date:08/24/2010

Opening Event Date:08/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/22/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/04/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/30/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorZurich American Insurance CompanyN
Charles J. O'Hara NN
Mark T. KrauseYY
IntervenorEastern ElectricN
Charles J. O'Hara NN
Mark T. KrauseYY
PetitionerJamil F. Muhammad N
Benjamin T. BoscoloYY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
John L. Davie NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/24/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
08/24/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
08/25/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. & Gregory Lamb, Esq.
10/22/2010RECORD ON APPEAL w/ 1/9/07 hearing
10/22/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/27/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
12/08/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until December 30, 2010 (unopposed)
12/10/2010 On consideration of petitioner's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before December 30, 2010. (JAC)
12/30/2010PETITIONER'S BRIEF
12/30/2010APPENDIX
01/31/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO 2/17/11
02/04/2011 On consideration of respondent's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before February 17, 2011. (JAC)
02/09/2011INTERVENOR'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF
02/10/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE - Eastern Electric & Zurich American Insurance Co.,on behalf of Resp.
02/14/2011RECEIVED - intervenor's brief
02/16/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/4/11 (unopposed) dwm (D.C.)
03/03/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 3/10/11
03/10/2011RECEIVED Respondent's Memo in Lieu of Brief.
03/22/2011ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Eastern Electric & Zurich American Insurance Company as interveners in this matter. It is (MORE)
03/22/2011ORDER GRANT INTV MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief. It is (MORE)
03/22/2011ORDER GRANT RESP MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the Clerk shall file the lodged statement in lieu of brief. It is F/O that this matter shall be scheduled before a merits division of this court as soon as the calendar permits. (ETW)
03/22/2011INTERVENOR'S BRIEF
03/22/2011MEMORANDUM/STATEMENT IN LIEU OF BRIEF (D.C.)
03/22/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/01/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/05/2011LETTER - from D.C. letting court know that they will not be participating in the argument in this case
07/25/2011FiledAppearance by - Mark T. Krause on behalf of the Intervenors, Eastern Electric and Zurich American Insurance Co. (Intervenor Eastern Electric, Intervenor Zurich American Insurance Company)
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/04/2011FiledArgued Before Fisher,Blackburne-Rigsby,Schwelb. Benjamin T.Boscolo Esq.,for Petitioner Mark T.Krause Esq.,for Respondent
01/05/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
01/30/2012FiledMandate