judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAFONTAINE (JOSEPH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38162
Short Caption:LAFONTAINE (JOSEPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48713
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010261Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/27/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/12/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/12/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11882
08/06/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on August 1, 2001, appointing Mary Lou Wilson as counsel for appellant. 01-13259
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, Ms. Wilson has not filed a notice of appearance with this court. Ms. Wilson shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve a notice of appearance on behalf of appellant. All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date of filing of the notice of appearance. 01-17861
10/25/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Mary Lou Wilson. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-17978
12/05/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 12/05/01. 01-20385
12/05/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-20387
12/31/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve the required documents or show cause why sanction should not be imposed. 01-21895
01/04/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 02-00245
01/04/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-00246
01/08/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: No postmark. 02-00463
01/18/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 01/18/02. 02-01302
02/27/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-03670
02/27/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/14/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-04598
04/09/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04875
04/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 11, 2002. 02-04875