Case: 05-87-00557-CR
05-87-00557-CR
05/20/1987
Sexual Abuse, Rape or Injury of a Child
Pearson, Christopher Clay
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/21/2019 | Retention time case file will be retained | Retain | |
03/16/2000 | Record Retention | Retain | |
01/15/1988 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/15/1988 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/17/1987 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/17/1987 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/16/1987 | Submitted | | |
11/16/1987 | Submission | | |
11/16/1987 | Submitted | | |
10/07/1987 | MattConv | | |
10/07/1987 | Submission | | |
07/24/1987 | Brief Filed | | |
07/24/1987 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/24/1987 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/29/1987 | Brief Filed | | |
06/15/1987 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
06/01/1987 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
05/27/1987 | Transcript Filed | | |
05/20/1987 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/15/1987 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/23/1987 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/15/1988 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Ed Kinkeade
F86-80231-UM
7 years TDC