judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7492
A-7492
08/18/1959
Application for Writ of Error
HARVEY RENTZ, ET AL.
FIRST NATIONAL BANK IN CORSICANA, ET AL., WILL WILSON, ATTORNEY GENERAL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/21/1959Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/08/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
08/26/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
08/18/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/27/1959Response to Motion filed
10/21/1959Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/08/1959Response to Petition
08/26/1959Response to Petition
08/18/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
08/18/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
First National Bank in Corsicana, et al.Respondent
Will Wilson, Attorney GeneralRespondent
Harvey Rentz, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information