judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7513
A-7513
09/04/1959
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
JOY WILLIAMS
48TH DISTRICT COURT, TARRANT COUNTY, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/21/1959Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/19/1959Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
09/04/1959Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
09/04/1959Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
09/04/1959Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/19/1960Letter Filed
01/06/1960Opinion issued
01/06/1960Order from Lower Court filed
11/21/1959Response to Brief filed
11/19/1959Brief in Support of Petition
09/10/1959Bond
09/04/1959Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
09/04/1959Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/04/1959Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
48th District Court, Tarrant County, TexasRespondent
Joy WilliamsPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information