judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TITTLE (VON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34826
Short Caption:TITTLE (VON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991240Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08679
09/20/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 11, 1999. Court Reporter: Lee Bahr. 99-08908
09/21/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 15, 1999. Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. 99-08996
10/04/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal 99-09502
10/21/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-10285
10/21/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.