judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAURETTA A. WILSON-CARTER V. D.C. DEP'T OF HEALTH

Case Information: 10-AA-1027
Short Caption:LAURETTA A. WILSON-CARTER V. D.C. DEP'T OF HEALTHClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Dept of Health
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOH00229-10Filed Date:08/23/2010

Opening Event Date:08/23/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/29/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLauretta A. Wilson-Carter NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of HealthN
Todd S. KimNY
Donna M. MuraskyNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/23/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
08/23/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
08/23/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
08/26/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
09/03/2010RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
09/07/2010TMC - motion to dismiss - oppo - reply
09/08/2010PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION- to respondent's motion to dismiss AND answer to respondent's motion for want of jurisdiction (titled as : petitoner's Motion to not to dismiss and answer the respondent's motion for want of jurisdiction)
09/13/2010RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to Petitioner's Opposition (Titled as: Response to Motion not to dismiss)dwm
09/24/2010PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- to respondent's response to motion not to dismiss
09/28/2010 ORDERED that RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS the appeal IS GRANTED. See DC Code 8-1902 (g)(1) (2010 Supp.). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall transfer this PFR to the Superior Court to be filed NPT to August 23, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (KRNBST) (rl)
09/28/2010DISMISSED
09/29/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived