judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7475
A-7475
08/11/1959
Application for Writ of Error
MISSOURI PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
NOE RAMIREZ
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/10/1959Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/03/1959Response to Reply filedRespondent
09/25/1959Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/09/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
08/20/1959Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
08/11/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/16/1959Response to Motion filed
11/10/1959Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/03/1959Response to Reply filed
09/25/1959Reply to Response
09/09/1959Response to Petition
08/20/1959Supplemental Brief filed
08/15/1959Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
08/11/1959Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/11/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Missouri Pacific Railroad CompanyPetitioner
Noe RamirezRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information