Case: WR-89,666-01
WR-89,666-01
03/20/2019
11.07 HC
AGUILAR, GERONIMO SCOTT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/21/2019 | ACTION TAKEN | HC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-with Hear |
| ||
04/15/2019 | SUPP/CLERK RECORD |
| |||
04/05/2019 | SUPP/CLERK RECORD |
| |||
03/28/2019 | OBJECTION/FINDINGS |
| |||
03/20/2019 | WRIT RECEIVED |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/21/2019 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
AGUILAR, GERONIMO SCOTT | Applicant | Gary A. Udashen |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-15-00373-CR
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
C-213-W011376-1327533-A