judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7470
A-7470
08/07/1959
Application for Writ of Error
STELLA ANN MASTERSON ET AL., LAWTHER CORPORATION, SUN OIL COMPANY AND FARISH GROUP, FARISH GROUP, STELLA ANN MASTERSON, ET AL., SUN OIL COMPANY, E. E. WEAVER, ET AL., LAWTHER CORPORATION
TEXAS PACIFIC COAL AND OIL COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/14/1960Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/14/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/13/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/13/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/08/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/21/1960Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/13/1960Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/08/1960Response to PetitionPetitioner
11/20/1959Letter brief Petitioner
11/16/1959Letter brief Respondent
10/03/1959Response to PetitionPetitioner
09/08/1959Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
08/21/1959Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/17/1959Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/14/1959Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/07/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/07/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/07/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/07/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
08/07/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/16/1960Motion to Argue filedOverruled
04/14/1960Brief in Support of Petition
04/14/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/13/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/13/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/08/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/30/1960Dissenting opinion issued.
03/30/1960Opinion issued
03/21/1960Supplemental Brief filed
01/13/1960Supplemental Brief filed
01/08/1960Response to Petition
11/20/1959Letter brief
11/16/1959Letter brief
10/28/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/28/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/28/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/28/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/28/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/28/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/28/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/28/1959Document received (See Remarks)
10/03/1959Response to Petition
09/08/1959Brief in Support of Petition
08/21/1959Response to Petition
08/17/1959Response to Petition
08/14/1959Response to Petition
08/07/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/07/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/07/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledOverruled
08/07/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/07/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/07/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lawther CorporationPetitioner
Farish GroupPetitioner
Texas Pacific Coal and Oil CompanyRespondent
Stella Ann Masterson, et al.Petitioner
E. E. Weaver, et al.Petitioner
SUN OIL COMPANYPetitioner
Stella Ann Masterson et al., Lawther Corporation, Sun Oil Company and Farish GroupPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information