Case: 05-17-00192-CV
05-17-00192-CV
02/23/2017
Mandamus
In Re: Vanessa Swarovski
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/23/2017 | Appendix filed | Relator |
| ||||
02/23/2017 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/12/2017 | Sent to publisher | | |||||||
04/11/2017 | Response filed |
| |||||||
04/11/2017 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
04/10/2017 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
04/07/2017 | Response filed |
| |||||||
03/22/2017 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
03/22/2017 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
03/22/2017 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||||
03/07/2017 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||
03/07/2017 | Response due | | |||||||
02/28/2017 | Order entered | Otherwise Disposed |
| ||||||
02/24/2017 | Submitted | | |||||||
02/23/2017 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
02/23/2017 | Appendix filed |
| |||||||
02/23/2017 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/22/2023 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Enger, Randy | Real party in interest | Randy Enger |
Swarovski, Vanessa | Relator | Brandy N. Hoge C. Gregory Shamoun Kenneth J. Lambert |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Dallas
Honorable D'Metria Benson
CC-13-07017-A