judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7467
A-7467
08/06/1959
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF DALLAS
RIDDLE AND USELTAN, VIRGIE E. PRESSNELL AND WIFE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/25/1959Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/04/1959Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/01/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
08/24/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
08/06/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/04/1959Response to Motion filed
11/25/1959Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/04/1959Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/01/1959Response to Petition
08/24/1959Response to Petition
08/06/1959Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/06/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Riddle and UseltanRespondent
Virgie E. Pressnell and wifeRespondent
City of DallasPetitioner
Will Wilson, Attorney General of TexasAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information