Case: 13-19-00116-CV
13-19-00116-CV
03/18/2019
Contract
Jose Luis Moreno
Norma Ocadiz, as administrator for Cesar Baltazar, Individually and d/b/a Naytex Builders and South Texas Properties
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/23/2020 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | Appellee | | ||
07/23/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||
04/24/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/27/2020 | Oral argument denied |
| |||||
07/31/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
07/23/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
07/23/2020 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | | |||||
06/22/2020 | Fee paid | | |||||
06/22/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
06/03/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
05/22/2020 | Fee paid | | |||||
05/22/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
04/24/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
04/24/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
02/20/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/12/2020 | Fee paid | | |||||
02/12/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/27/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
11/26/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/26/2019 | Fee paid | | |||||
11/26/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/21/2019 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
11/21/2019 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
11/21/2019 | Email received | | |||||
11/20/2019 | Telephone call received | | |||||
11/20/2019 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||
11/15/2019 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
11/15/2019 | Email sent | | |||||
11/04/2019 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
11/04/2019 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
10/29/2019 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
10/29/2019 | Email sent | | |||||
10/04/2019 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
10/04/2019 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
09/05/2019 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||
08/05/2019 | Case reinstated |
| |||||
08/05/2019 | Email received | | |||||
06/19/2019 | Email received | | |||||
05/24/2019 | Email received | | |||||
04/17/2019 | Email received | | |||||
04/12/2019 | Letter filed | | |||||
04/10/2019 | Order issued | Abated |
| ||||
04/10/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
04/02/2019 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
04/02/2019 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
04/01/2019 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
03/19/2019 | Amended notice of appeal filed | | |||||
03/18/2019 | Notice of defect regarding perfection of the notice of appeal | | |||||
03/18/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed |
| |||||
03/18/2019 | Fee paid | | |||||
03/18/2019 | Motion received | | |||||
03/18/2019 | Fee paid | | |||||
03/18/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
03/18/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
12/28/2018 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
12/07/2018 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/24/2020 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Norma Ocadiz, as administrator for Cesar Baltazar, individually and d/b/a Naytex Builders and South Texas Properties | Appellee | Hon. Jared Clark Hon. Francisco J. Rodriguez Hon. Danielle C. Rodriguez |
Moreno, Jose Luis | Appellant | Hon. Oscar Alvarez |
Trial Court Information
275th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Marla Cuellar
C-2889-16-E
Dahlia Robledo