Case: 14-19-00229-CR
14-19-00229-CR
03/18/2019
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Shannon Bernard Jackson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/30/2020 | Amended brief filed | Anders |
| ||||
09/22/2020 | Brief struck | | |||||
05/06/2020 | Amended brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
04/09/2020 | Brief struck | | |||||
11/19/2019 | Waiver of remaining time to file brief | State |
| ||||
11/14/2019 | Anders brief filed | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/10/2020 | Case stored | | |||||
12/10/2020 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
12/09/2020 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||
11/16/2020 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |||||
11/16/2020 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||||
10/30/2020 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
10/30/2020 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
10/15/2020 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
10/15/2020 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||
10/15/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||||
10/14/2020 | Submitted | | |||||
10/02/2020 | Amended brief due | | |||||
09/30/2020 | Amended brief filed |
| |||||
09/22/2020 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||
09/22/2020 | Brief struck | | |||||
09/22/2020 | Order entered |
| |||||
05/20/2020 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
05/06/2020 | Amended brief filed |
| |||||
05/05/2020 | Order entered |
| |||||
04/20/2020 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
04/09/2020 | Brief struck | | |||||
04/09/2020 | Order entered |
| |||||
01/31/2020 | Response due | | |||||
01/21/2020 | Letter filed |
| |||||
01/17/2020 | Letter filed | | |||||
01/16/2020 | Order entered |
| |||||
01/13/2020 | State brief due | | |||||
01/07/2020 | Letter filed |
| |||||
01/07/2020 | Motion to access appellate record disp | DENIED |
| ||||
12/30/2019 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
12/30/2019 | Response due | | |||||
12/16/2019 | Motion to access appellate record filed |
| |||||
12/16/2019 | Anders response due | | |||||
12/10/2019 | Order entered |
| |||||
12/10/2019 | Motion to access appellate record disp | GRANTED | | ||||
12/02/2019 | Motion to access appellate record filed |
| |||||
11/21/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
11/19/2019 | Waiver of remaining time to file brief |
| |||||
11/14/2019 | Anders brief filed |
| |||||
11/14/2019 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||||
11/14/2019 | Letter filed |
| |||||
11/04/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/04/2019 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
10/22/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
10/18/2019 | Response due | | |||||
10/16/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
10/08/2019 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
10/04/2019 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
08/19/2019 | Response due | | |||||
08/08/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
08/08/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
08/07/2019 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
08/05/2019 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
07/05/2019 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
07/05/2019 | Reporters record due | | |||||
07/05/2019 | Record due | | |||||
05/22/2019 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
03/18/2019 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested |
| |||||
03/18/2019 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
03/11/2019 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
03/07/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
03/07/2019 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/10/2020 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
12/10/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas Ex Rel, Travis J. Koehn, Austin County District Attorney | Criminal - State of Texas | Jack Roady Rebecca Klaren |
Jackson, Shannon Bernard | Criminal - Appellant | Shannon Bernard Jackson |
Trial Court Information
56th District Court
Galveston
Honorable Judge, 56th District Court
17-CR-3031
Court Reporter, 56th District Court
40 Yrs. TDCJ